Feagan, Nancy Jean (CPSO#: 50534)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Feagan, Nancy Jean Prior (used until: 15 Dec 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nancy Feagan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 1462 Adelaide Street North London, ON N5X 1J9
Instructions: Please contact Dr. Caitlin Fitzpatrick for medical record inquiries.
Date Received: 28 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015