Feakins, Martin John (CPSO#: 93110)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Jun 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
26 Dundas Street West
Napanee ON  K7R 1Z4
Phone: (613) 544-4900 Ext. 38100
Fax: (613) 540-6139
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

525 Montreal Street
Kingston ON  K7K 3H9
Canada
Phone: 6135406165
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Queen's University Postal Bag 603
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Canada
Phone: 6135485567
Fax: (613) 540-6139
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

5748 Hinchinbrooke Road
Hartington ON  K0H1W0
Canada
Phone: 6133286146
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Feakins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Feakins ( CPSO# 93110 )

Business Address:
26 Dundas Street
Napanee ON  K7R 1Z4
Phone Number: (613) 544-4900

Business Address:
Queen's University Postal Bag 603
Department of Psychiatry
Providence Care Mental Health
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 548-5567

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 18 Nov 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Oct 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Martin John Feakins may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry.