Feanny, Stephen John (CPSO#: 50535)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
9780 Bramalea Road North
Brampton ON  L6S 2P1
Phone: (905) 791-2390
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 103E
4581 Highway 7
Unionville ON  L3R 1M6
Canada
Phone: (905) 479-9693
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Feanny Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Feanny ( CPSO# 50535 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
9780 Bramalea Road North
Brampton ON  L6S 2P1
Phone Number: (905) 791-2390

Business Address:
Suite 103E
4581 Highway 7
Unionville ON  L3R 1M6
Phone Number: (905) 479-9693

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN JOHN FEANNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEANNY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 May 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1986