Fearon, Margaret Anne (CPSO#: 53467)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Blood Services
Medical Office
67 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2M1
Phone: (416) 313-4598
Fax: (416) 974-9757
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Blair Fearon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fearon ( CPSO# 53467 )
Dr. S. Fearon ( CPSO# 52993 )

Business Address:
603 - 2 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4V 1L5
Phone Number: (416) 962-2023

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 29 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET ANNE FEARON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEARON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1983