Fecteau, David (CPSO#: 86977)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Laval University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Sep 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2008