Feder, Stephen Hersh (CPSO#: 30860)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2571
Fax: (613) 738-4878
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen H. Feder Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Feder ( CPSO# 30860 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN HERSH FEDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEDER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1991