Federman, Nicholas John (CPSO#: 103477)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital, LHSC
800 Commissioners Road East
Department of Emergency Medicine
London ON  N6A5W9
Phone: (519) 264-2800
Electoral District: 02

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 06 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 06 Oct 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr.  Nicholas  John  Federman  shall practise medicine as required by the
                  postgraduate medical education program  in which Dr. Federman is enrolled
                  at the University of Western Ontario.

            (2)   In Dr. Federman's practice in the postgraduate medical education program,
                  Dr. Federman shall prescribe drugs only for  in-patients  or out-patients
                  of  a  clinical  teaching  unit  that  is  formally  affiliated with  the
                  department  where  Dr.  Federman is properly practising medicine  and  to
                  which postgraduate trainees  are  regularly assigned by the department as
                  part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In Dr. Federman's practice in the postgraduate medical education program,
                  Dr. Federman shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr. Federman may practise emergency  medicine  and  to  the extent of his
                  employment at the following locations while under supervision coordinated
                  by a supervisor acceptable to the College;
                  
                  (a)   Wingham and District Hospital Wingham;

                  (b)   Four Counties Health Services Corporation Newbury; and

                  (c)   Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound.

            (5)   In Dr. Federman's practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr.  Federman  may
                  not charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. Federman must thereupon
                  cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education
                  program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when   Dr.   Federman  is  no  longer  enrolled  in  a  program  of
                        postgraduate medical  education  provided  by  a  medical school in
                        Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when  Dr. Federman no longer holds Canadian citizenship,  permanent
                        resident  status,  or  a  valid  employment authorization under the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate  automatically  converts   to  a  regular  Postgraduate
                  Education  certificate  and  Dr.   Federman  must immediately  cease  all
                  practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of
                  the following occurs:

                  (a)   the supervisors identified in paragraph  (4)  notify the College of
                        any concerns regarding Dr. Federman's practice,  including  but not
                        limited   to  concerns  regarding  knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the supervisors  are  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue to
                        supervise Dr. Federman's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval  for  Dr.   Federman  to  engage  in practice outside  the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when  Dr.  Federman's  employment  as specified  in  paragraph  (4)
                        ceases; or
                  
                  (e)   if Dr. Federman takes a leave of absence,  or  transfers to another
                        program,  from  the  postgraduate  education program  specified  in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In   the  event  of  conversion  to  a  regular  Postgraduate   Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7)  or  expiry  of  the certificate under
                  paragraph  (7),  Dr.  Federman  may not resume any practice  outside  the
                  postgraduate medical education program  under the restricted registration
                  for residents policy until Dr. Federman applies  for a new certificate of
                  registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2017.  In accordance with paragraph
                  6(a), this certificate of registration expires on  June  30,  2018.   All
                  practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice   outside   the  postgraduate  medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.