Feerasta, Sharmeen Hakim (CPSO#: 84005)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Aga Khan University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 212
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone: (416) 497-1987
Fax: (416) 497-0712
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharmeen Feerasta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Feerasta ( CPSO# 84005 )

Business Address:
212 - 4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone Number: (416) 497-1987

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARMEEN HAKIM FEERASTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEERASTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2007