Fehlings, Darcy Lynn (CPSO#: 52496)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Holland Bloorview Kids
Rehabilitation Hospital
150 Kilgour Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Phone: (416) 425-6220 Ext. 3586
Fax: (416) 424-3837
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael G. Fehlings Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fehlings ( CPSO# 52496 )
Dr. M. Fehlings ( CPSO# 52495 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 4W - 449
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5627

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARCY LYNN FEHLINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEHLINGS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1985