Fehlings, Michael George (CPSO#: 52495)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Suite 4W-449
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5627
Fax: (416) 603-5298
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael G. Fehlings Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fehlings ( CPSO# 52496 )
Dr. M. Fehlings ( CPSO# 52495 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 4W - 449
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5627


Corporation Name: Massicotte Tymianski Gentili Mohammadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Hillcrest Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Lyndhurst Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL GEORGE FEHLINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEHLINGS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Research Fellows - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1985