Fehr, Kenneth Bruce (CPSO#: 55305)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 28 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Dec 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 1990