Feig, Denice Suzan (CPSO#: 50539)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Feb 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Feb 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Lebovic Building Suite L5 027
Mailbox 14
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-8590
Fax: (416) 361-2657
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles Lefkowitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lefkowitz ( CPSO# 101463)
Dr. A. Lefkowitz ( CPSO# 32044 )
Dr. D. Feig ( CPSO# 50539 )

Business Address:
650 Sammon Avenue
K Wing
Suite 403
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone Number: (416) 778-0000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 08 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENICE SUZAN FEIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEIG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1988