Feigel, Roman (CPSO#: 30677)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish, Ukrainian

Education:Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1081 Carling Avenue
Suite 204
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613) 728-0474
Fax: (613) 728-8381
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 04 Aug 2016

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Feigel’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Feigel engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and in the sexual abuse of two patients by making inappropriate and/or sexual comments, holding a patient’s hand, and touching or rubbing or gesturing towards his groin area while making comments of a sexual nature to the patient, touching another patient’s bottom and nipples in an inappropriate and/or sexual manner and conducting an inappropriate internal examination.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Hearing Dates: September 12 to 15, 2017 and September 26, 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 04 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 4, 2016, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Roman Feigel in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Feigel to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                           DR. ROMAN FEIGEL
                                            ("Dr. Feigel")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Feigel, certificate of registration number 30677, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Feigel, acknowledge that the College has referred to the
                  Discipline Committee, allegations that I engaged in sexual abuse of two
                  patients and disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct
                  including by making inappropriate/sexual comments and touching and
                  conducting an inappropriate internal examination. 

            (4)   I, Dr. Feigel, have read the Notice of Hearing dated June 15, 2016, which
                  sets out the allegations against me.  I am aware of the College's concern
                  about protecting the public and I understand the nature of the
                  allegations against me.

            (5)   I, Dr. Feigel, acknowledge that the College has accepted this Undertaking
                  in lieu of making an Order under section 37 of the Code.


            (6)   I, Dr. Feigel, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until
                  the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the
                  Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Feigel, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall not
                        engage in any professional encounters with female patients of any
                        age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place
                        in the presence of a monitor who is a female regulated health
                        professional acceptable to the College (the "Practice Monitor"),
                        and unless the other requirements provided in this Undertaking are
                        fulfilled. For further clarity, I understand that I must not be
                        alone with any female patient, for any length of time, during any
                        professional encounter, whether or not the parent or guardian of
                        the patient is also present.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Feigel, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Practice
                        Monitor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and
                        understand what is required of the Practice Monitor including, but
                        not limited to:
                  
                        1.    providing reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's
                              undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis; 
                  
                        2.    remaining present at all times during all professional
                              encounters with all female patients; 
                  
                        3.    carefully observing all of my professional encounters with
                              female patients, including but not limited to physical and
                              internal examinations.  I further acknowledge my obligation
                              to ensure the Practice Monitor's view of all of my
                              professional encounters with female patients, including
                              physical and internal examinations, is unobstructed at all
                              times; 
                  
                        4.    refraining from performing any other functions, except those
                              required in the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as
                              Appendix "A",  while observing me in all my professional
                              encounters with female patients; 
                  
                        5.    maintaining a log of all female patient encounters in the
                              form attached to this Undertaking as Appendix "B" (the
                              "Log");
                  
                        6.    initialing all corresponding entries in the records of
                              patients noted in the Log; and
                  
                        7.    submitting the original Log to the College on a monthly
                              basis.
                  
                  
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Feigel, undertake and agree to maintain my own copy of the
                        Log at all times, and to make it available to the College upon
                        request. 
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Feigel, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
                  that I practise or have privileges including, but not limited to,
                  hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days of executing this
                  Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of
                  any and all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing
                  practice at that location.

            (9)   Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Feigel, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall post
                        a sign in my waiting room(s) and each of my examination and
                        consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, in the form set out in Appendix "C"
                        that states: "Dr. Feigel must not have professional encounters with
                        female patients, of any age, unless in the presence of a female
                        practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and
                        Surgeons of Ontario.  Dr. Feigel must not be alone during any
                        professional encounter with any female patient. Further information
                        may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Feigel, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in any
                        language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (9)(a), in my waiting room(s) and each of my examination
                        and/or consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a
                        clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at
                        Appendix "C."
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Feigel, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (9)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Feigel, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
                        will notify the College prior to providing any such services.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Feigel, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (9)(b) prior to providing
                        services in the language(s) described in section (9)(d).
                  
            (10)  Notifying Patients

                  (a)   I, Dr. Feigel, undertake to ensure that each patient scheduled for
                        an appointment with me is directly notified, prior to the
                        appointment, of the details of the restriction described in section
                        (7)(a). 
                  
                  (b)   If the appointment referred to in section 10(a) above is scheduled
                        to take place more than seven (7) days after the date on which it
                        is booked, I, Dr. Feigel, undertake to ensure that each patient
                        scheduled for an appointment with me is directly notified, within
                        seven (7) days after the appointment is scheduled, of the details
                        of the restriction described in section (7)(a).

            (11)  I, Dr. Feigel, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may
                  result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee
                  of the College (the "Discipline Committee").

            (12)  I, Dr. Feigel, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent legal counsel
                  in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to
                  do so.

            (13)  In the event of an appeal of any order of the Discipline Committee, I,
                  Dr. Feigel, agree that if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (14)  I, Dr. Feigel, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (15)  I, Dr. Feigel, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (16)  I, Dr. Feigel, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Feigel is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee
                        into allegations that he engaged in sexual abuse of two patients
                        and disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct including
                        by making inappropriate/sexual comments and touching and conducting
                        an inappropriate internal examination. As a result of the referral:
                  
                        Dr. Feigel must not engage in any professional encounters with
                        female patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient
                        encounter takes place in the presence of a monitor who is a female
                        regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless
                        the other requirements provided in his Undertaking with the College
                        are fulfilled.  For further clarity, Dr. Feigel must not be alone
                        with any female patient during any professional encounter.
                  
                        Dr. Feigel shall post a sign in the waiting room(s) and in each
                        examination room and consulting room, in all his Practice
                        Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states:
                        "Dr. Feigel must not have professional encounters with female
                        patients of any age, unless in the presence of a female practice
                        monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
                        Ontario.  Dr. Feigel must not be alone with any female patient
                        during any professional encounter. Further information may be found
                        on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
            C.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Feigel, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Feigel, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "D".

            (19)  I, Dr. Feigel, consent to submit and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient records by the College
                  and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor
                  my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Feigel, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Practice Monitors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  b)    any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (21)  I, Dr. Feigel, give my irrevocable consent to all Practice Monitors to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Practice Monitor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A"; and/or
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking.
                  
            (22)  I, Dr. Feigel, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 4, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Roman Feigel to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 4, 2016:

Dr. Feigel is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations that he engaged in sexual abuse of two patients and disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct including by making inappropriate/sexual comments and touching and conducting an inappropriate internal examination. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Feigel must not engage in any professional encounters with female patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the presence of a monitor who is a female regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in his Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Feigel must not be alone with any female patient during any professional encounter.

Dr. Feigel shall post a sign in the waiting room(s) and in each examination room and consulting room, in all his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Feigel must not have professional encounters with female patients of any age, unless in the presence of a female practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Feigel must not be alone with any female patient during any professional encounter. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.
Download Full Document (PDF)