Feigenbaum, Annette Sylvia Joy (CPSO#: 58991)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
Dept of Pediatrics and Genetics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5340
Fax: (416) 813-5345
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNETTE SYLVIA JOY FEIGENBAUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEIGENBAUM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1991