Feigenberg, Tomer (CPSO#: 93915)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Oct 2013

Expiry Date:  26 Oct 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Oct 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Department of Obstetrics
& Gynecology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 1841
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tomer Feigenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Feigenberg ( CPSO# 93915 )
Dr. M. Inbar-Feigenberg ( CPSO# 95141 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 27 Oct 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Oct 2013
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Oct 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Tomer Feigenberg may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Division of
                        Gynaecologic Oncology, Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology,
                        University of Toronto, in which Dr. Feigenberg holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Feigenberg  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Feigenberg's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Feigenberg's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on October 27, 2013.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration committee automatically expire on October 26, 2020.