Feindel, Christopher Michael (CPSO#: 29923)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 May 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 1978


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Room 4N-480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5909
Fax: (416) 340-4476
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. M. Feindel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2007

Dr. C. Feindel ( CPSO# 29923 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
4N-480 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5909

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 28 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL FEINDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEINDEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1978