Feiner, Hannah Luce Rose (CPSO#: 90783)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Family Practice Unit
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 867-7426
Fax: (416) 867-7498
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANNAH LUCE ROSE FEINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEINER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 02 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2011