Feinmesser, Raphael (CPSO#: 57602)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The Hebrew University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991