Feinstein, David Manuel (CPSO#: 26957)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Sep 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2010