Fejer, Imre Bela (CPSO#: 23005)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Apr 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Apr 1980

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
4125 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1E 2S2
Phone: (416) 284-9111
Fax: (416) 284-5077
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I Fejer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Fejer ( CPSO# 23005 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
4125 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1E 2S2

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1980
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Apr 1980

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Apr 1980 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Imre B. Fejer may not purchase or possess injectable narcotic drugs,
            effective April 23, 1980.