Fekete, Eva Maria (CPSO#: 66772)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Nov 2000