Felcenbuch Dachis, Harry Leon (CPSO#: 53197)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Main National University of San Marcos, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Lake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 2166
Fax: (905) 830-5987
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARRY LEON FELCENBUCH DACHIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELCENBUCH DACHIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 17 Aug 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 18 Aug 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Jul 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1997