Feld, Jordan Jay (CPSO#: 71450)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Toronto Centre for Liver Disease
200 Elizabeth Street
9EN-240
Toronto ON  M5C 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4584
Fax: (416) 340-4533
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jordan Feld Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Feld ( CPSO# 71450 )

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 340-4584

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Toronto Centre for Liver Disease
200 Elizabeth Street
9EN-240
Toronto ON  M5C 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4584

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 05 Oct 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JORDAN JAY FELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001