Feldberg, Melissa Robyn (CPSO#: 76298)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: Dennis, Melissa Robyn (used until: 28 Feb 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2nd Floor
50 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4T 1M9
Phone: (416) 921-1066
Fax: (416) 921-8459
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA ROBYN FELDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELDBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2003