Feldkamp, Matthias Michael (CPSO#: 63723)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 1055 5500 Wayzata Boulevard Golden Valley, MN 55416 USA
Date Received: 03 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 07 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Resident 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2015