Feldman, Brian Michael (CPSO#: 55515)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division Of Rheumatology
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5828
Fax: (416) 813-4989
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 28 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 21 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN MICHAEL FELDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELDMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1988