Feldman, Jacob (CPSO#: 60386)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Oct 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The Hebrew University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1920 Weston Road
Suite 213
Weston ON  M9N 1W4
Phone: (416) 249-6236
Fax: (416) 249-5273
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACOB FELDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELDMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Aug 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 06 Oct 1995
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 07 Oct 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 06 Oct 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Oct 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1996