Feldman, Kimberley Michelle (CPSO#: 72193)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Family Practice Centre
77 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6060
Fax: (416) 323-6351
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bay Centre for Birth Control
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 351-3700
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY MICHELLE FELDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELDMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000