Feldman, Mark Elliott (CPSO#: 58470)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Mar 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave
Toronto ON
Rm 7252 Black Wing
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 813-7391
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 02 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ELLIOTT FELDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELDMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1989