Feldman, Perle Beth (CPSO#: 70880)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Yiddish

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Discovery Family Health 77 Provost Dr North York, ON M2K 0B7 Tel: (416) 901-7407
Instructions: Medical records location as per above.
Date Received: 16 Apr 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Apr 1999 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018