Feldman, Ross Douglas (CPSO#: 29946)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
IH Asper Institute CR1056
St. Boniface Hospital
369 Tache Ave
Winnipeg MB  R2H 2A6
Phone: (204) 235-3324
Fax: (204) 233-8783

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSS DOUGLAS FELDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELDMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1989