Feldmann, Joseph (CPSO#: 23973)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Melbourne, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 St. Clair Avenue East
Suite 606
Toronto ON  M4T 2V7
Phone: (416) 961-2282
Fax: (416) 961-2282
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph Feldmann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Feldmann ( CPSO# 23973 )

Business Address:
Suite 606
1 St. Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4T 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 961-2282

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH FELDMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELDMANN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1971