Fell, David Ashley (CPSO#: 50542)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
712 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C3
Phone: (905) 853-2888
Fax: (905) 853-6607
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Fell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fell ( CPSO# 50542 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
712 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C3
Phone Number: (905) 853-2888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 01 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ASHLEY FELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1985