Fellegi, Vivien Susan (CPSO#: 64480)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2012