Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Felsen, Shim Seymour Izzy (CPSO#: 21424)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1968

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Don Valley Medical Associates Inc.
Fairview Family Health Network
Suite 144
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 491-5900
Fax: (416) 491-1149
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Felsen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Felsen ( CPSO# 21424 )

Business Address:
Don Valley Medical Associates Inc.
Fairview Family Health Network
Suite 144
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 491-5979

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIM SEYMOUR IZZY FELSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELSEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1968