Feltis, John Timothy (CPSO#: 33206)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 May 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 May 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Life Labs
100 International Blvd.
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone: (416) 675-4530 Ext. 42801
Fax: (416) 213-4206
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dept of Lab Medicine
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Ave. W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-2696
Fax: (905) 813-4132
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Dept of Lab Medicine
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Ave. W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-2696
Fax: (905) 813-4132
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tim Feltis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Feltis ( CPSO# 33206 )

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1

Business Address:
Life Labs
6560 Kennedy Road
Mississauga ON  L5T 2X4
Phone Number: (416) 909-4671

Business Address:
Life Labs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone Number: (416) 909-4671

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 01 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN TIMOTHY FELTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELTIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1982