Fenech, Darlene Sherry (CPSO#: 77133)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Surgical Oncology
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4027
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dennis Di Pasquale Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Di Pasquale ( CPSO# 71426 )
Dr. D. Fenech ( CPSO# 77133 )

Business Address:
Suite 410
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 949-8855


Corporation Name: Dr. Darlene Fenech Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fenech ( CPSO# 77133 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Surgical Oncology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room T2063
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4027

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARLENE SHERRY FENECH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FENECH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2001 to 13 Jan 2002
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2002 to 17 Nov 2002
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 05 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Nov 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2005