Feneck, Mary Margaret (CPSO#: 50543)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 24 2012

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 300, 690 Dorval Drive, Oakville, ON L6K 3W7
Date Received: 29 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016