Feng, Luming (CPSO#: 68841)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
277 Wilson Street East
Ancaster ON  L9G 2B8
Phone: (905) 648-7973
Fax: (905) 648-2582
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Luming Feng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Feng ( CPSO# 68841 )

Business Address:
277 Wilson Street East
Ancaster ON  L9G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 648-7973

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUMING FENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1997