Fennell, Jeremy Paul (CPSO#: 88416)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Precision Sport & Spine
2334 Lakeshore Road West
Oakville ON  L6L 1H5
Phone: (905) 847-5755
Fax: 855-892-6240
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeremy Fennell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fennell ( CPSO# 88416 )

Business Address:
Precision Sport & Spine
2334 Lakeshore Road West
Oakville ON  L6L 1H5
Phone Number: (905) 847-5755

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEREMY PAUL FENNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FENNELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2014

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 14, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)