Fennell, Susan Dianne (CPSO#: 61093)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5357 Fernbank Road
Kanata ON  K2S 1B6
Phone: (613) 831-7300
Fax: (613) 831-7377
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN DIANNE FENNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FENNELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1990