Fenner, Danuta Zofia (CPSO#: 42275)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016