Fenyves, Daphna (CPSO#: 30841)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 28 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 May 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1980
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2014