Ferasol, Jairie Dale (CPSO#: 71455)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Malden Clinic
5881 Malden Road
La Salle ON  N9H 1S5
Phone: (519) 966-2473
Fax: (519) 966-8961
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jairie Ferasol Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ferasol ( CPSO# 71455 )

Business Address:
5881 Malden Road
La Salle ON  N9H 1S5
Phone Number: (519) 966-2473

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAIRIE DALE FERASOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERASOL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999