Ferdinand, Jae-Marie Denise (CPSO#: 56293)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montreal Children's Hospital
1001 Decarie Boulevard
Montreal QC  H4A 3J1
Phone: (514) 412-4400
Fax: (514) 412-4271

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAE-MARIE DENISE FERDINAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERDINAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1985