Ferenc, Aleksandra Monika (CPSO#: 97323)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Feb 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Reflex Medical Centre
1-3470 Laird Road
Mississauga ON  L5L 5Y4
Phone: (905) 820-6000
Fax: (905) 820-6090
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Feb 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 25 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 25 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 25 Feb 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Aleksandra  Monika  Ferenc  may  practise medicine independently in family
            medicine.