Ferencz, Sean James (CPSO#: 77301)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Newcastle, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2002 to 31 Jan 2003
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003