Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Ferguson, Anne Louise (CPSO#: 62404)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CMHA, EM ACT TEAM, Suite 500
1200 Markham Road
Toronto ON  M1H 3C3
Phone: (416) 759-7957 Ext. 3209
Fax: (416) 289-6843
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

8th Floor, NYGH
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario
M4G 1Z8
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6320
Fax: (416) 756-3144
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anne Ferguson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ferguson ( CPSO# 62404 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
8th Floor
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6320

Business Address:
C M H A East Metro Act Team
Suite 500
1200 Markham Road
Toronto ON  M1H 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 289-6285

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE LOUISE FERGUSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERGUSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 15 Nov 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1991