Ferguson, Ian Keith (CPSO#: 53840)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Strathroy Medical Clinic
74 Front Street East
Strathroy ON  N7G 1Y7
Phone: (519) 245-0430
Fax: (519) 245-5577
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Keith Ferguson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Ferguson ( CPSO# 53840 )

Business Address:
Strathroy Medical Clinic
74 Front Street East
Strathroy ON  N7G 1Y7
Phone Number: (519) 670-0346

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Oct 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN KEITH FERGUSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERGUSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1984 to 14 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1985