Ferguson, James Mclean (CPSO#: 31362)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Yukon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017